Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Klaus Münst von Uttenweiler, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1745³Born
23 Jul 176620.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Dec 177025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Dec 180156.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
5 Sep 180256.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
29 Nov 181267.2DiedTitular Bishop of Myndus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Klaus Münst von Uttenweiler
Bishop Klaus Münst von Uttenweiler O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Myndus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUttenwerler, Germany

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018