Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1540AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
12 Apr 1547AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
13 Sep 1553DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Muñoz
Bishop Miguel Muñoz (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoyatos, Diocese of Cuenca

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 52, Number 277
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320, and Page 174
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,540, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast