Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iver Munk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ribe, Denmark


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470¹Born
17 Apr 149929.2AppointedBishop of Ribe, Denmark
8 Nov 153464.8ResignedBishop of Ribe, Denmark
9 Feb 153969.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ribe, Denmark

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iver Munk (VIAF: 171910318)
Bishop Iver Munk (born 1470, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ribe

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1499, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 17 Jan 2021

Quantcast