Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cesare Muni e Forno

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Messina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1746Born
16 Mar 177124.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 178236.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
23 Sep 178236.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia

MicroData Summary for Cesare Muni e Forno
Father Cesare Muni e Forno (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164, and Page 451
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 28
  • ~ob: AT, 24 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast