Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Mulligan, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
1697¹Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
19 Aug 1730SelectedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
1 Sep 1730ConfirmedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
23 Jul 1739DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Mulligan
Bishop Peter Mulligan O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

  • a priest for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 49
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 84, and Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast