Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michel Joseph Mulloy

Bishop-Elect of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

Administrator of Rapid City, South Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1953 Born
8 Jun 197926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
1986²32.6IncardinatedPriest of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
2019²65.6AppointedAdministrator of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
19 Jun 202067.0AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
9 Jul 202067.1CeasedAdministrator of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
1 Oct 202067.3Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Joseph Mulloy
Father Michel Joseph Mulloy (born ) Bishop-Elect of Duluth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMobridge, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota
Ordained BishopDuluth, Diocese of Duluth, Minnesota

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Duluth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2020
  • bd/ob: CB, 19 Jun 2020
  • c2: CB, 28 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jun 2020

Quantcast