Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Mucedola

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1807BornSan Paolo di Civitate
1829¹21.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 184841.6SelectedBishop of Conversano, Italy
11 Dec 184841.8ConfirmedBishop of Conversano, Italy
1849¹41.9Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
22 Mar 186558.1DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe-Maria Mucedola (VIAF: 55476900)
Bishop Giuseppe-Maria Mucedola (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016