Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georgius Martonffi

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666¹BornKurez-Falva
23 Dec 169024.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Mar 169125.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 171347.1SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
20 Aug 171448.6ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
1721¹55.0DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georgius Martonffi:
Bishop Georgius Martonffi (born 1666, died 1721) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015