Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Teobaldo Giorgio Moscatelli, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1889Born
21 Mar 190616.6ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
16 Jul 194353.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
8 Oct 195465.1AppointedAbbot of Order of Cistercians
196676.3ResignedAbbot of Order of Cistercians
23 Apr 197080.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

MicroData Summary for Teobaldo Giorgio Moscatelli
Abbot Teobaldo Giorgio Moscatelli O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVisso, Italy

  • a priest for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017