Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agapito Cardinal Mosca

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1678BornPesaro, Italy
1 Oct 173254.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Nov 173254.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
174364.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
21 Aug 176082.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Agapito Mosca:
Agapito Cardinal Mosca (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a cardinal for 27.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Oct 1732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015