Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Morosini

Deceased

Bishop of Modon (Medone)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1364AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
27 Jul 1365Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
21 Nov 1390AppointedBishop of Modon (Medone), Greece
1407²DiedBishop of Modon (Medone), Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Morosini
Bishop Lodovico Morosini (died 1407) Bishop of Modon (Medone)

  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 288, and Page 352
  • b/c2+: CB, 3 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016