Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giosuč Mormile

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tropea


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Mar 1413AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
18 Dec 1430AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
6 Feb 1437AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
1445¹ResignedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giosuč Mormile:
Bishop Giosuč Mormile Bishop Emeritus of Tropea

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 257, and Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 76, and Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013