Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Montjoie

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1421AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
25 Jul 1423AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
14 Feb 1424AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
3 Apr 1451DiedBishop of Béziers, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Montjoie
Bishop Guillaume de Montjoie (died ) Bishop of Béziers

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 531, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 390
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast