Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aymon di Montfalcon (Montfaucon), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1443²BornFlaccieu
16 May 149148.4AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
9 Jul 149148.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
22 May 149754.4AppointedAdministrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
1509²66.0ResignedAdministrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
10 Aug 151774.6DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aymon di Montfalcon (Montfaucon):
Bishop Aymon di Montfalcon (Montfaucon) O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Lausanne

  • a bishop for 26.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014