Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gastón de Montcada

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1324AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
5 Dec 1328AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
12 Aug 1334DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gastón de Montcada
Bishop Gastón de Montcada (died ) Bishop of Gerona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 261, and Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast