Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio de Montalvo Olivera, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529²BornCoca, Spain
15 Dec 158051.9AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
1581²52.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
16 Nov 158758.8AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
11 Dec 159263.9DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio de Montalvo Olivera:
Bishop Gregorio de Montalvo Olivera O.P. (died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 11.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 94, Number 584
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338, and Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015