Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Münchhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1540AppointedBishop of Curland, Latvia
9 Jan 1542AppointedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
6 Mar 1560DiedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Johann von Münchhausen (VIAF: 300425996)
Bishop Johann von Münchhausen (died ) Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 264, and Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast