Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Maria Mondio

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Titular Bishop of Myriophytos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1795Born
185054.3AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
15 Mar 185256.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
4 Sep 185762.0DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Maria Mondio
Bishop Paolo Maria Mondio (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast