Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alois Mohn, M.F.S.C. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lydenburg, South Africa

Priest of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1880Born
189817.0ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
190423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Dec 192645.9AppointedPrefect of Lydenburg, South Africa
193958.0ResignedPrefect of Lydenburg, South Africa
5 Jun 194564.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lydenburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Alois Mohn
Father Alois Mohn M.F.S.C. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lydenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKiwitten

  • a priest for 41.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017