Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Donato Antonio Moffa, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1811Born
4 May 183422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Feb 185543.5SelectedBishop of Boiano, Italy
23 Mar 185543.6ConfirmedBishop of Boiano, Italy
15 Apr 185543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
1863¹51.4DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Donato Antonio Moffa
Bishop Lorenzo Donato Antonio Moffa O.F.M. Obs. (born , died 1863) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiccia di Molise
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,732
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016