Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Walram von Moers

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1385Born
14 Jul 145065.5SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
14 Oct 145065.7ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
3 Oct 145671.7DiedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Walram von Moers (VIAF: 81615020)
Father Walram von Moers (born 1385, died ) Bishop-Elect of Münster

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 41*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast