Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rafael Morales Duque, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1929Born
12 Nov 194920.1EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
13 Jul 195828.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 May 199464.6AppointedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
22 Jul 199464.8InstalledPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
13 Feb 200171.4ResignedPrefect of Guapi, Colombia
7 Jan 202191.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Guapi, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Morales Duque
Father Rafael Morales Duque O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Guapi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo
Ordained PriestBogotá

  • a priest for 62.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 8 Jan 2021

Quantcast