Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franc Močnik

Deceased

Former Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

Titular See: (AA of the portion in Slovenia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1907Born
17 Mar 193426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
14 Sep 194739.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
28 Feb 194840.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
4 Nov 200093.1DiedPriest of Gorizia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franc Močnik
Father Franc Močnik (born , died ) Former Administrator of Gorizia e Gradisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIdrija, Slovenia
Death PlaceGorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia

  • a priest for 66.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast