Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Manrique, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1577Born
23 Jan 164567.9SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
12 Jun 164568.2ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
28 Feb 164972.0DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Angel Manrique
Bishop Angel Manrique O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCubel

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 175, Number 1,091
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast