Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Manrique de Lara y de Herrera, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
7 Jan 163049.0AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Nov 163049.9InstalledBishop of Santiago de Cuba
22 Jun 164463.4DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Manrique de Lara y de Herrera
Bishop Jerónimo Manrique de Lara y de Herrera O. de M. (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 153, Number 971
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018