Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasino Malabayla

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1509AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
26 Sep 1519AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
21 Mar 1525DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vasino Malabayla
Bishop Vasino Malabayla (died ) Bishop of Asti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 121
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast