Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Francesco Miroglio

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
23 Sep 162823.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 165550.9AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
14 Sep 1679³74.7DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Francesco Miroglio (VIAF: 304914992)
Bishop Gerolamo Francesco Miroglio (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontaneto

  • a priest for 50.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018