Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Minot

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Feb 1363AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
16 Apr 1363Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
10 Jul 1375DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Minot
Archbishop Thomas Minot (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,198
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 May 2019

Quantcast