Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Milón López

Deceased

Archbishop of the Titular See

Titular See: Edessa; (Abbot of San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1680BornPorto Longone, Italy
5 Apr 174565.1AppointedArchbishop of the Titular See
4 Jul 174565.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of the Titular See
4 Jun 176282.2DiedArchbishop of the Titular See

MicroData Summary for Antonio Milón López:
Archbishop Antonio Milón López (born , died ) Archbishop of Titular See

  • a bishop for 16.9 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013