Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Milliet de Challes

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1599BornTurino
27 Nov 164141.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
31 Aug 164242.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
31 Oct 165656.8DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Milliet de Challes:
Bishop Paul Milliet de Challes (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a bishop for 14.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 235
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015