Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Janez Mihelčič, S.J.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kyrgyzstan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1942 Born
23 Mar 197532.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Aug 201674.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kyrgyzstan
29 Aug 201775.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Kyrgyzstan

MicroData Summary for Janez Mihelčič
Father Janez Mihelčič S.J. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kyrgyzstan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadovljica, Slovenia

Please contact the Father through the Apostolic Administration of Kyrgyzstan.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast