Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Miguélez Mendaña

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1656²Born
13 Jul 171458.5SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
17 Sep 171458.7ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
15 Dec 171761.9DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Miguélez Mendaña
Bishop Juan Miguélez Mendaña (born 1656, died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCubillos del Sil

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 32, Number 93
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast