Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabio Cardinal Mignanelii

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lucera

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹BornSiena
15 Nov 154044.9AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
20 Nov 155155.9Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155155.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
17 May 155357.4AppointedAdministrator of Grosseto, Italy
2 Oct 155357.8ResignedAdministrator of Grosseto, Italy
12 Jun 155660.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
10 Aug 155761.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Mignanelii:
Cardinal Fabio Mignanelii (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucera

  • a cardinal for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • bd/ab/c/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013