Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Fausto Maria Mezza, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1885Born
14 Aug 191024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Oct 195670.9AppointedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
1967²81.1ResignedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
23 Dec 197085.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fausto Maria Mezza (VIAF: 89241132)
Abbot Fausto Maria Mezza O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 60.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967
  • r/d: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast