Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Gasparo Cardinal Mezzofanti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1774Born
179722.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 183863.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
12 Feb 183863.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 184974.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gasparo Mezzofanti
Giuseppe Gasparo Cardinal Mezzofanti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Italy

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a cardinal for 11.0 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast