Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Karl Heinrich von Metternich-Winneburg

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Mainz

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1622BornKoblenz
166542.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
9 Jan 167956.5SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Jan 167956.5SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
4 Sep 167957.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
4 Sep 167957.1ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
26 Sep 167957.2DiedArchbishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Heinrich von Metternich-Winneburg:
Priest Karl Heinrich von Metternich-Winneburg (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Mainz

  • a priest for 14.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 271, and Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013