Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Esteban Gabriel Cardinal Merino

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Administrator of Bovino

Bishop of Gaeta

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472¹Born
9 May 151341.3AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
1514¹42.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
17 Dec 151644.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
12 Jun 152351.4AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
2 Sep 153058.6AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
21 Feb 153361.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 153361.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
5 Sep 153462.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
17 Feb 153563.1AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
15 Apr 153563.2AppointedAdministrator of Bovino, Italy
28 Jul 153563.5DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Esteban Gabriel Merino
Esteban Gabriel Cardinal Merino (born 1472, died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantisteban del Puerto, Diocese of Jaén
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 129, and Page 200
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 135
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 29, Number 98
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast