Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Meppen, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Larissa in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440¹Born
24 Jan 147737.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
24 Jan 147737.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Larissa in Syria
9 Feb 147737.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Larissa in Syria
1495²55.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
15 Nov 149656.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Meppen (VIAF: 233438856)
Bishop Johannes Meppen O.S.A. (born 1440, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeppen
Ordained BishopSanta Maria dell’Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 172, and Page 279
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1477, Number 1
  • ob: CB, 31 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Dec 2018

Quantcast