Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal de’ Medici di Ottaiano

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1808BornNaples, Italy
16 Jun 185647.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jun 185647.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
11 Oct 185748.9DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Francesco de’ Medici di Ottaiano:
Cardinal Francesco de’ Medici di Ottaiano (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013