Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Mendavia, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Dec 1537AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
2 Aug 1538Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
6 Oct 1540DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Mendavia:
Bishop Francisco de Mendavia O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 2.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,628
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 49, Number 261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013