Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vasco Rodrigues (de Meneses Fernandes)

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
26 May 1363AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
23 Jul 1364AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
16 Jun 1371AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
11 Aug 1371AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
18 Nov 1372DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Vasco Rodrigues (de Meneses Fernandes)
Archbishop Vasco Rodrigues (de Meneses Fernandes) (died ) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 144, and Page 507
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 196, and Page 235
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast