Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop António de Mendonça

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1600Born
15 Dec 167070.8AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1671²70.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
14 Feb 167575.0DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António de Mendonça
Archbishop António de Mendonça (born , died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 397
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,671, Number 71
  • bd/d: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast