Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso de Mena y Borja

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664²BornLeón
8 May 170238.3AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
16 Jul 170238.5Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
4 Oct 171450.7DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso de Mena y Borja:
Bishop Ildefonso de Mena y Borja (born 1664, died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,631
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 22, Number 21
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015