Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexandre Awi Mello, P. Schönstatt

Secretary of the Dicastery for Laity, Family and Life


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1971 Born
7 Jul 200130.4Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
31 May 201746.3AppointedSecretary of the Dicastery for Laity, Family and Life

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Awi Mello (VIAF: 64923381)
Father Alexandre Awi Mello P. Schönstatt (born ) Secretary of Laity, Family and Life

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for Laity, Family and Life.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast