Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Meléndez de Valdés

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1483AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
1491¹ResignedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
27 Mar 1493AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
23 Jun 1494AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
27 Dec 1506DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Meléndez de Valdés
Bishop Diego Meléndez de Valdés (died ) Bishop of Zamora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 97, and Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 271
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Dec 2018

Quantcast