Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Betrand de Meissenier

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jul 1348AppointedBishop of Apt, France
4 Jun 1358AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
30 Oct 1362DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Betrand de Meissenier
Archbishop Betrand de Meissenier (died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 95, and Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast