Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Mendes de Távora

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹Born
5 Jul 163236.5ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
22 Mar 163842.2AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
1 Jul 164650.5DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Mendes de Távora
Bishop João Mendes de Távora (born 1596, died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155, and Page 285
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018