Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Mdzewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1744³BornKondraiec
24 Jun 176823.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 179147.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
19 Dec 179147.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
1792¹47.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
1814¹69.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Mdzewski
Bishop Michael Mdzewski (born , died 1814) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 193, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016