Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas MacDermot Roe

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697¹Born
20 Apr 174750.3SelectedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
8 May 174750.3ConfirmedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
15 Feb 1751³54.1DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas MacDermot Roe
Bishop Thomas MacDermot Roe (born 1697, died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilronan, Co. Roscommon
Buried Place (Original)Kilronan, Co. Roscommon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 40
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast