Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thaddeus McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1455¹Born
29 Mar 148227.2AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
3 May 148227.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
3 Aug 148328.5RemovedBishop of Ross, Ireland
21 Apr 149035.3AppointedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
24 Oct 149237.8DiedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus McCarthy
Bishop Thaddeus McCarthy (born 1455, died ) Bishop of Cork and Cloyne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne Cacco, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225, and Page 137
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Dec 2018

Quantcast